Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryProbate Administration (Informal) |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 22 Creditor Claim Filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd on Behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation Creditor Claim Filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates Ltd on Behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 21 Affidavit Supporting Claim Against The Decedents Estate Affidavit Supporting Claim Against The Decedents Estate |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 20 Affidavit Supporting Claim Against The Decedents Estate Affidavit Supporting Claim Against The Decedents Estate |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 19 Claim against Estate (Verizon Wireless) Claim against Estate (Verizon Wireless) |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 18 Statement of Creditor's Claim - AscensionPoint Recovery Services ($195.25) Statement of Creditor's Claim - AscensionPoint Recovery Services ($195.25) |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Certificate of Service on Espeseth Huss Certificate of Service on Espeseth Huss |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 16 Statement of Claim by Sanford Health $17641.31 Statement of Claim by Sanford Health $17641.31 |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 15 Claim Against Estate - JPMorgan Chase Bank ($804.26) Claim Against Estate - JPMorgan Chase Bank ($804.26) |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 14 Claim Against Estate - Discover Card ($2,687.50) Claim Against Estate - Discover Card ($2,687.50) |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 13 Claim Against Estate Claim Against Estate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.