Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Forcible Detainer case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Hammes, Jason Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $1,262.21Creditor: MetroPlains Management LLCDebtor: Carolyn Zins (ActiveEntered: 12/30/2022Docketed: 12/30/2022, 2:35 PMDamages: $1,262.21Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHammes, Jason Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $1,262.21Creditor: MetroPlains Management LLCDebtor: Carolyn Zins (ActiveEntered: 12/30/2022Docketed: 12/30/2022, 2:35 PMDamages: $1,262.21Interest Rate: 6.50% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryForcible Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Declaration of Service by Mailing Upon Defendant Declaration of Service by Mailing Upon Defendant |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 20 Notice of Entry of Judgement Notice of Entry of Judgement |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 18 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 16 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 17 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hammes, Jason) Via Zoom - meeting ID 732 936 9394 or 1-669-900-9128 Result: Hearing Ended Via Zoom - meeting ID 732 936 9394 or 1-669-900-9128 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hammes, Jason) Via Zoom - meeting ID 732 936 9394 or 1-669-900-9128 Via Zoom - meeting ID 732 936 9394 or 1-669-900-9128 |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 14 Proposed Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Proposed Judgement Filed by Plaintiff |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Return of Service Upon Defendant Return of Service Upon Defendant |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 12 Proposed Statement of Costs Filed by Plaintiff Proposed Statement of Costs Filed by Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.