Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Romanick, Bruce A. Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Mid Dakota Clinic P.C., a corporationDebtor: Kody Koenig (ActiveEntered: 12/05/2022Docketed: 12/05/2022, 10:32 AMDamages: $1,010.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRomanick, Bruce A. Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Mid Dakota Clinic P.C., a corporationDebtor: Kody Koenig (ActiveEntered: 12/05/2022Docketed: 12/05/2022, 10:32 AMDamages: $1,010.00Interest Rate: 6.50% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 18 Full Satisfaction of Judgment against Kody Koenig Full Satisfaction of Judgment against Kody Koenig |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Certificate of Service (Kody Koenig) Certificate of Service (Kody Koenig) |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 16 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 15 Default Default |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 14 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document - Defendant not Found Index # 10 Sheriffs Return (Kody Koenig) Sheriffs Return (Kody Koenig) |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document - Defendant not Found Index # 12 Sheriffs Return (Kody Koenig) Sheriffs Return (Kody Koenig) |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 6 Proposed Order for Judgment - filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Proposed Order for Judgment - filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 3 Sheriffs Return (Kody Koenig) Sheriffs Return (Kody Koenig) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.