Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, ND, . Grant County, ND Superior Courts with Nieuwsma, Lindsey Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $2,658.31Creditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Kristi R Devitt (ActiveEntered: 01/11/2023Docketed: 01/11/2023, 10:05 AMDamages: $2,648.31Current Costs Due: 05/01/2023, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 10.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNieuwsma, Lindsey Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $2,658.31Creditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Kristi R Devitt (ActiveEntered: 01/11/2023Docketed: 01/11/2023, 10:05 AMDamages: $2,648.31Current Costs Due: 05/01/2023, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 10.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeExecution Index # 19 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 19 issued issued |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice to Entry of Judgment - Kristi R Devitt Notice to Entry of Judgment - Kristi R Devitt |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice to Entry of Judgment - Kristi R Devitt Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice to Entry of Judgment - Kristi R Devitt |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 14 of Costs of Costs |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 16 | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 15 of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 1 Affidavit of Service - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Kristi R Devitt Affidavit of Service - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Kristi R Devitt |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 13 Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc Judgment - filer DCI Credit Services Inc |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 11 Declaration of Cost - filer DCI Credit Services Inc Declaration of Cost - filer DCI Credit Services Inc |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 4 Exhibit A - List of Accounts Exhibit A - List of Accounts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.