Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, ND, . Grant County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2022 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Informal) |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGrant County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 12 Affidavit of Publication: Notice to Creditors Affidavit of Publication: Notice to Creditors |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice and Information to Heirs Notice and Information to Heirs |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 10 Affidavit of Mailing: Notice and Information to Heirs Affidavit of Mailing: Notice and Information to Heirs |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Affidavit of Mailing: Notice to Dept. of Human Services Affidavit of Mailing: Notice to Dept. of Human Services |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Appointment of a Personal Representative Index # 7 | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 8 | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 6 Last Will and Testament of Harold Finck (complete document) Last Will and Testament of Harold Finck (complete document) |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 5 or Rejection of Petition for Informal Probate or Rejection of Petition for Informal Probate |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 3 Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of Personal Representative Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of Personal Representative |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 2 Last Will and Testament of Harold Finck Last Will and Testament of Harold Finck |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.