Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, ND, . Grant County, ND Superior Courts with Storbakken, Bonnie Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Hospital Services IncDebtor: Wanda K Block (ActiveEntered: 03/10/2022Docketed: 03/10/2022, 10:05 AMDamages: $1,968.03Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStorbakken, Bonnie Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Hospital Services IncDebtor: Wanda K Block (ActiveEntered: 03/10/2022Docketed: 03/10/2022, 10:05 AMDamages: $1,968.03Interest Rate: 6.50% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Declaration of Service by Mail - Declaration of Service by Mail - |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 18 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 16 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Declaration of Service by Mail - Wanda Block Declaration of Service by Mail - Wanda Block |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 15 on Default on Default |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 13 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 14 | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 12 Declaration of Service by Mail - Wanda Block Declaration of Service by Mail - Wanda Block |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 6 Declaration of Identification and Non-Military Service Declaration of Identification and Non-Military Service |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 10 Exhibit A - Assignment Exhibit A - Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.