Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, ND, . Grant County, ND Superior Courts with Borgen, Daniel Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $2,761.23Creditor: Midland Credit Management, IncDebtor: Wayne Nagel (ActiveEntered: 08/16/2021Docketed: 08/16/2021, 1:17 PMDamages: $2,751.23Current Costs Due: 01/25/2022, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBorgen, Daniel Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $2,761.23Creditor: Midland Credit Management, IncDebtor: Wayne Nagel (ActiveEntered: 08/16/2021Docketed: 08/16/2021, 1:17 PMDamages: $2,751.23Current Costs Due: 01/25/2022, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 6.50% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 19 Issued Issued |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement Index # 18 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Certificate of Service by Mail of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Wayne Nagel Certificate of Service by Mail of Notice of Entry of Judgment of Wayne Nagel |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 16 Notice of Entry of Judgment of Wayne Nagel Notice of Entry of Judgment of Wayne Nagel |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 14 for Summary Judgment for Summary Judgment |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 15 Summary Judgment Summary Judgment |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 13 of Costs and Disbursements of Costs and Disbursements |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 12 Notice Of Motion Notice Of Motion |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 8 Order For Judgment Filed By Midland Credit Management, Inc Order For Judgment Filed By Midland Credit Management, Inc |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 9 Summary Judgment Filed By Midland Credit Management, Inc Summary Judgment Filed By Midland Credit Management, Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.