Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Burke County, ND, . Burke County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2021 |
CategoryProbate Of Will (Informal) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBurke County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Affidavit of Publication (serving the public) Affidavit of Publication (serving the public) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 11 Proof of Service by Mail (serving heirs) Proof of Service by Mail (serving heirs) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Affidavit of Forwarding Copy of Petition and Notice to Creditors to Department of Human Services Affidavit of Forwarding Copy of Petition and Notice to Creditors to Department of Human Services |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 10 Notice and Information to Heirs and Devisees Notice and Information to Heirs and Devisees |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index # 8 | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 7 Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Statement of Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 6 | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Appointment of Personal Representative Index # 1 Application for Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative Application for Informal Probate of Will and Appointment of a Personal Representative |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Waiver Index # 2 Declination to Serve Declination to Serve |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Index # 3 Last Will and Testament **Received and Filed with the Clerk of Court Office** Last Will and Testament **Received and Filed with the Clerk of Court Office** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.