Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sandoval, Maricela, Sandoval, Alan, Sandoval, Danilo, Sandoval, Llanet, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Vera, Juan J, Esq., against Bright Development, Roofing Supply Group Inc, Hickman Roofing & Supply, represented by Kirtland - Packard Llp, Wild Carey - Fife, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Vanderwall, David G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVanderwall, David G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2006 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Party Only | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
March 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.