Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Helbling Inc, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Zuckerman, Laurentiu, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Harassment: Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
January 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Protective Restraining Order | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Court Trial After Evidence | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.