Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Great Seneca Fiancial Corporat, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude &Amp; Felix Apc, against Cicolani, Patrick D, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beauchesne, Roger M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeauchesne, Roger M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2006 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
July 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.