Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Michael & Associates, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael &Amp; Associates Pc, against 715 Harrison, Llc, City Nights - Forum Cafe, City Nights, Rouge Cafe - Nightclub, 715 Harrison Incorporated, (total of 6) See All represented by Hodges, Melvin S, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Vanderwall, David G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVanderwall, David G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2007 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
May 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.