We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Chowan County Department Of Social Services Vs Anita Riddick

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Chowan County Department Of Social Services, filed a(n) General Civil Action case against Riddick, Anita, in the jurisdiction of Chowan County. This case was filed in Chowan County Superior Courts Chowan District Court.

Case Details for Chowan County Department Of Social Services v. Riddick, Anita

Filing Date

March 20, 2024

Category

General Civil Action

Last Refreshed

April 10, 2024

Filing Location

Chowan County, NC

Filing Court House

Chowan District Court

Parties for Chowan County Department Of Social Services v. Riddick, Anita

Plaintiffs

Chowan County Department Of Social Services

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Riddick, Anita

Other Parties

Cherry, Deanna (Dss Social Worker)

Copeland, Donna (Caretaker)

Cowand, Lindsee (Party)

Mcnair, Jaquesha (Party)

Riddick, James (Party)

Case Documents for Chowan County Department Of Social Services v. Riddick, Anita

Other/Miscellaneous

Date: March 21, 2024

Case Events for Chowan County Department Of Social Services v. Riddick, Anita

Type Description
Docket Event Return of Service - Served
Docket Event Order to Continue
Docket Event Motion to Continue
Docket Event Other/Miscellaneous
Docket Event Certificate of Service
Docket Event Other/Miscellaneous
Docket Event Petition
Docket Event Notice Of Hearing on Motions
See all events

Related Content in Chowan County

Case

Local Government Federal Credit Union VS Thomas Leroy Leary
Jun 11, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001161-200

Case

Doris McLean VS Robert Goodman
Jun 25, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | 24CV001177-200

Case

Tabitha Rome VS Vernon Rome
Jul 05, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001199-200

Case

CHOWAN CO CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT AGENCY OBO VS ROBERT D GRAHAM, Jr.
Jul 27, 2017 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 17CVD000200-200

Case

JONES CO DSS OBO VS PATRICK S ROWELL, Sr.
Aug 29, 2017 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 17CVD000222-200

Case

Rhonda C Whitehurst VS Michael Large
Jun 14, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001168-200

Case

Midland Credit Management, Inc. VS Lance O Jordan
Jul 02, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001192-200

Case

Perry Motors, INC. VS Aaron Coston
Jun 26, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | 24CV001182-200

Case

County of Chowan VS Apostolic Faith Church of God and Christ Convocation
Jul 03, 2024 | Civil Action Foreclosure (CV) | Civil Action Foreclosure (CV) | 24CV001195-200

Case

CHOWAN CO CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT AGENCY OBO VS JERRY D STANLEY
Dec 12, 2011 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 11CVD000305-200

Case

CHOWAN CO CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT AGENCY OBO VS KAWANDA R RANKINS
Jan 31, 2008 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 08CVD000030-200

Case

Chowan Court II VS Nyshema Slade
Jul 02, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | 24CV001194-200

Case

Boone Hill Allen & Ricks Real Estate VS Adreanne Turner
Jun 27, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | 24CV001186-200

Document

Alliant Credit Union VS Patricia C. Cheek
Jul 05, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001198-200

Document

CHOWAN COUNTY CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT AGENCY OBO VS BRYAN P CASH
Oct 19, 2018 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 18CVD000191-200

Document

Alliant Credit Union VS Patricia C. Cheek
Jul 05, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001198-200

Document

Damarrian Kieyon Jackson VS Alize Leviana White
Jun 24, 2024 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 24CV001175-200

Document

Samantha L Johnson VS Jamil Johnson
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001200-200

Document

TAR RIVER LTC GROUP,LLC VS LULA CATHERINE JOHNSON
Nov 28, 2022 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 22CVS000196-200

Document

Alliant Credit Union VS Patricia C. Cheek
Jul 05, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001198-200

Document

Samantha L Johnson VS Jamil Johnson
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001200-200

Document

TAR RIVER LTC GROUP,LLC VS LULA CATHERINE JOHNSON
Nov 28, 2022 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 22CVS000196-200

Document

Samantha L Johnson VS Jamil Johnson
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001200-200

Document

TAR RIVER LTC GROUP,LLC VS LULA CATHERINE JOHNSON
Nov 28, 2022 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 22CVS000196-200

Document

Samantha L Johnson VS Jamil Johnson
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001200-200