Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lake Valley Retrievals Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Love, Franklin J, Esq., against Rios, Hector, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Griffin, John E, Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGriffin, John E, Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2005 |
Category3.740 Collections: Limited (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order of Examination
Date: November 02, 2011Civil Complaint
Date: March 28, 2005Order of Examination
Date: August 24, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Aging Stayed | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS Notice |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Order of Examination Order of Examination |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case on Hold | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Bankruptcy | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS Notice |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Order of Examination Order of Examination |
|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER FOR EXAMINATION Notice |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
MINUTE ORDER-Order of Examination Order of Examination |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.