We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

William Harris Vs Norris Properties Inc

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Harris, William, filed a(n) General Civil Action case against Norris Properties Inc, in the jurisdiction of Beaufort County. This case was filed in Beaufort County Superior Courts Beaufort Superior Court.

Case Details for Harris, William v. Norris Properties Inc

Filing Date

February 05, 2024

Category

General Civil Action

Last Refreshed

May 01, 2024

Filing Location

Beaufort County, NC

Filing Court House

Beaufort Superior Court

Case Complaint Summary

This complaint seeks damages for Breach of Contract and Unfair Trade Practices. The Plaintiff, a resident of Pitt County, North Carolina, entered into a contract with Defendant Norris Properties, Inc, a corporation created in North Carolina. The Plai...

Parties for Harris, William v. Norris Properties Inc

Plaintiffs

Harris, William

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Norris Properties Inc

Case Documents for Harris, William v. Norris Properties Inc

Extension Of Time

Date: April 11, 2024

Notice of Appearance

Date: April 11, 2024

Certificate of Service

Date: April 17, 2024

Complaint

Date: February 05, 2024

Civil Summons

Date: February 05, 2024

Order to Extend Time

Date: April 11, 2024

Cover Sheet

Date: February 05, 2024

Case Events for Harris, William v. Norris Properties Inc

Type Description
Docket Event Certificate of Service
Docket Event Extension Of Time
Docket Event Notice of Appearance
Docket Event Order to Extend Time
Docket Event Complaint
Docket Event Civil Summons
Docket Event Cover Sheet
See all events

Related Content in Beaufort County

Case

Bryant Logan Asby VS Jamie Leigh Elks
Jul 05, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001566-060

Case

James Moore VS Kimberly Charlene Gibbs
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | 24CV001572-060

Case

Stacy Jones VS Rhonda Jones
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001575-060

Case

RODNEY PAUL PFAHLER, Sr. VS VICKIE LYNNE PFAHLER
Jul 15, 2022 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 22CVD000502-060

Case

Josephine Paul VS Willie Harris
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | 24CV001574-060

Case

KEDERRICK Z DAILEY VS BETHANY ROSSIE
Feb 06, 2014 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 14CVD000084-060

Case

Kristi Rahn VS Matthew Rahn
Jul 05, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001567-060

Case

DEWARD BRAXTON SMITH VS RHODA LEANNE MIXON SMITH
Dec 08, 2022 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 22CVD000873-060

Case

Cornelius Eugene Keech, Jr. VS Sharon Harris Mackey
Jul 05, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001565-060

Case

SAMUEL JUSTIN FOSTER VS JENNIFER HOLLOWELL WATKINS
Nov 23, 2021 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 21CVD000998-060

Case

Beaufort Co Child Support Enforcement Agency obo Sabrina D Marshall VS Joe W Brewer
Jul 09, 2024 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 24CV001577-060

Case

Justin Alan Casey VS Kristen Ann Casey
Jul 09, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001581-060

Case

National Finance Company Inc VS Darnesha Shontrel Small
Jul 09, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | 24CV001576-060

Document

Justin Alan Casey VS Kristen Ann Casey
Jul 09, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001581-060

Document

DEWARD BRAXTON SMITH VS RHODA LEANNE MIXON SMITH
Dec 08, 2022 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 22CVD000873-060

Document

IN THE MATTER OF THE FORECLOSURE OF A DEED OF TRUST Deborah Mason-McKenzie
Jun 03, 2024 | Foreclosure (Special Proceeding) | Foreclosure (Special Proceeding) | 24SP001196-060

Document

Kristi Rahn VS Matthew Rahn
Jul 05, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001567-060

Document

NATIONAL FINANCE COMPANY INC VS SOLEESA RENE MORGAN
Jun 18, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | 24CV001518-060

Document

Jeffrey Duane Best VS Teresa House Best
Apr 23, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001349-060

Document

Josephine Paul VS Willie Harris
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | Civil Magistrate Summary Ejectment | 24CV001574-060

Document

KEDERRICK Z DAILEY VS BETHANY ROSSIE
Feb 06, 2014 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 14CVD000084-060

Document

Stacy Jones VS Rhonda Jones
Jul 08, 2024 | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | Civil Domestic with Absolute Divorce | 24CV001575-060

Document

NATIONAL FINANCE COMPANY INC VS FALISHA LYNN STRADER
Jul 05, 2024 | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | Civil Magistrate Small Claim Action (Not Summary Ejectment) | 24CV001568-060

Document

Cornelius Eugene Keech, Jr. VS Sharon Harris Mackey
Jul 05, 2024 | General Civil Action | General Civil Action | 24CV001565-060

Document

DYSHERA MORRIS VS RANDY BONNER, Jr.
Nov 15, 2023 | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | Civil Domestic without Claim for absolute divorce | 23CVD000869-060