Sotoa, Rapi L,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Manookian, Claude,
against
General Motors Llc,
South County Buick Gmc,
represented by
Shugart, Jonathan M,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Details for
Sotoa, Rapi L v. General Motors Llc
, et al.
Case Events for
Sotoa, Rapi L v. General Motors Llc
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 19, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from Meyer,John to Freestone,Loren effective 03/19/2023
November 21, 2022
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Judgment/Dismissal) Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sotoa, Rapi L.
September 08, 2022
Docket Event
Answer (First Papers) Answer (WITH POS) filed by General Motors LLC.
August 10, 2022
Docket Event
Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document) Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Sotoa, Rapi L. Refers to: General Motors LLC
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Summons issued.
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.
Judge: Meyer John
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment SD Case initiation form printed.
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Complaint (Case Initiation) Complaint filed by Sotoa, Rapi L. Refers to: General Motors LLC; South County Buick GMC
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets) Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sotoa, Rapi L. Refers to: General Motors LLC; South County Buick GMC
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns) Original Summons filed by Sotoa, Rapi L. Refers to: General Motors LLC; South County Buick GMC