Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Keating Building Llc, Mercantile Property Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ross, Peter, Ross, Peter; Schwartz, Richard Adam, against Midland Loan Services Inc, Sbs Trust Deed Network, Wells Fargo Bank National Association As Trustee For The Registered Holders Of Comm 2012- Ccre 5 Commercial Mortgage Passthrough Certificates, represented by Robins, Thomas M Iii, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Order - Other (GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TRO AND OSC) filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC.
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/12/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF EDWARD KAEN) filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/26/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Response (TO EVIDENTIARY OJECTIONS) filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: February 02, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF RICHARD A SCHWARTZ) filed by KEATING BUILDING LLC; MERCANTILE PROPERTY LLC.
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.