Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jones, Jesse, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Sonntag, Albert R, against Luvima Group Incorporated, Summertime Properties Llc, Yerba Mate Bar And Empanadas, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Jones, Jesse.
Date: February 02, 2023Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Jones, Jesse.
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: December 02, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/02/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.