Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hall, Doug, Kelleher, Tim, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Renda, Vincent, against Esrium Llc, Geenen, Fir M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with James A Mangione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames A Mangione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2022 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kelleher, Tim; Hall, Doug. Refers to: Geenen, Fir; Esrium LLC
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: July 26, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: July 26, 2022Writ of Attachment filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim. Refers to: Esrium LLC
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Kelleher, Tim; Hall, Doug. Refers to: Geenen, Fir; Esrium LLC
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: July 26, 2022Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/05/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Posting Undertaking filed by Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Writ of Attachment (Amended) filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to James Mangione effective 08/09/2023
Date: August 09, 2023Request for Entry of Default filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim. Refers to: Geenen, Fir
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Complaint filed by Kelleher, Tim; Hall, Doug. Refers to: Geenen, Fir; Esrium LLC
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: August 18, 2022Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Hall, Doug; Kelleher, Tim.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.