Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kerfan, Hanna, against Perez, Brian E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel F. Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel F. Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Perez, Brian
Date: September 23, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 23, 2021Answer submitted by Perez, Brian E rejected on 10/22/2021.
Date: October 22, 2021Request for Entry of Default filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Perez, Brian
Date: December 13, 2021Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Perez, Brian
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Perez, Brian
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.
Date: September 30, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.