Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Byron, Kaden, against Barnes, Gregory, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren G. Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration - Other filed by TD Bank USA NA.
Date: January 24, 2022Writ of Execution submitted by TD Bank USA NA received but not filed on 12/05/2022.
Date: December 05, 2022Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by TD Bank USA NA.
Date: February 02, 2022Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Venue) filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: BARNES, GREGORY
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: BARNES, GREGORY
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: BARNES, GREGORY
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: BARNES, GREGORY
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by TD Bank USA NA.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: BARNES, GREGORY
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.