Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Blanda, Jon O.; Kerfan, Hanna, Kerfan, Hanna, against Yang, Elaine, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren G. Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Judgment by Default by Court filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Refers to: YANG, ELAINE
Date: August 15, 2022Proof of Service filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Refers to: YANG, ELAINE
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: June 20, 2022Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Date: July 30, 2022Original Summons filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Refers to: YANG, ELAINE
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Affidavit - Other filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: June 20, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. Refers to: YANG, ELAINE
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Order - Other filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: June 20, 2022Declaration - Other filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.