Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Acosta, Ashley, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hernandez Lopez, Cesario, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Request - Other (EX PARTE REQUEST AND ORDER TO TERMINATE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - GRANTED) filed by Acosta, Ashley. Refers to: Hernandez Lopez, Cesario | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Other (for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes) filed by Acosta, Ashley. Refers to: Hernandez Lopez, Cesario
Judge: for All Purposes) filed by Acosta Ashley Refers to: Hernandez Lopez Cesario |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice as to Hernandez Lopez, Cesario . | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/08/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 was vacated. | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice as to Acosta, Ashley . | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/13/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 12/08/2021 at 08:30AM in Department N-03. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Acosta, Ashley. Refers to: Hernandez Lopez, Cesario | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Request filed by Hernandez Lopez, Cesario. | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Acosta, Ashley. Refers to: Hernandez Lopez, Cesario |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.