Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stambaugh, John, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Stambaugh, Louise, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 11/30/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) dismissed without prejudice. | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Stambaugh, John. Refers to: Stambaugh, Louise | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 10/12/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse continued pursuant to party's motion to 11/30/2021 at 08:30AM in Department N-03. | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (GRANTED) filed by Stambaugh, John. Refers to: Stambaugh, Louise | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stambaugh, John. Refers to: Stambaugh, Louise | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Removal from Residence filed by Stambaugh, John. Refers to: Stambaugh, Louise | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.