Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hober, Amanda, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Prince, Jamilla, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/02/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/13/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 11/02/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department E-21. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Hober, Amanda. Refers to: Prince, Jamilla; Sightler, Nathaniel; Sightler, Naila | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Hober, Amanda. Refers to: Prince, Jamilla; Sightler, Nathaniel; Sightler, Naila | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Hober, Amanda. Refers to: Prince, Jamilla; Sightler, Nathaniel; Sightler, Naila | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hober, Amanda. Refers to: Prince, Jamilla; Sightler, Nathaniel; Sightler, Naila |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.