Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Salet, Keri L, against Dunn, Kevin N, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Dunn, Kevin
Date: September 07, 2021Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Dunn, Kevin
Date: September 07, 2021Proof of Service filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.
Date: September 13, 2021Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA. Refers to: Dunn, Kevin
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA.
Date: January 04, 2022Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (per CCP 664.6) filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA; Dunn, Kevin N.
Date: November 04, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.