Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Espinoza, Adrianna, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Ayala, Alyssa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Garry G. Haehnle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarry G. Haehnle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice. | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/23/2022 01:30:00 PM. | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case reassigned from S-09 to S-07 effective 01/27/2022. | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Per order of the Court/ request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 03/23/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department S-16.
Judge: Dwayne K. Moring |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/23/2021 01:30:00 PM. | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Espinoza, Adrianna. Refers to: Ayala, Alyssa | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (CHTRO) filed by Espinoza, Adrianna. Refers to: Ayala, Alyssa | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Espinoza, Adrianna. Refers to: Ayala, Alyssa; Negron, Angelina; Negron, Raul; Negron, Annalisse; Palmore, Anna | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Espinoza, Adrianna. Refers to: Ayala, Alyssa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.