Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alcantar, Josue Emmanuel, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Chin-Paez, Marbella, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/20/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal SD generated. | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/29/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Alcantar, Josue Emmanuel. | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Request filed by Alcantar, Josue Emmanuel. | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated. | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/20/2021 at 09:00AM in Department C-61. | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Court Hearing filed by Chin-Paez, Marbella. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.