Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Debt Management Partners Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P., against Bonete, Katherine, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: BONETE, KATHERINE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: BONETE, KATHERINE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: BONETE, KATHERINE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: BONETE, KATHERINE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BONETE, KATHERINE. Refers to: Debt Management Partners LLC
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/18/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: March 18, 2022Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-03 .
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: March 30, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by BONETE, KATHERINE.
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Debt Management Partners LLC; BONETE, KATHERINE.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted (2/25/2022) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00General Denial filed by BONETE, KATHERINE.
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/25/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: July 06, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.