Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ayala, Miguel, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Arce, Candice, Golden, Lucas, Thomas, Rick, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/18/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Ayala, Miguel. Refers to: Thomas, Rick; Golden, Lucas; Arce, Candice | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 10/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department E-21. | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/27/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Ayala, Miguel. Refers to: Arce, Candice | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Ayala, Miguel. Refers to: Golden, Lucas | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Ayala, Miguel. Refers to: Thomas, Rick | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Ayala, Miguel. Refers to: Thomas, Rick; Golden, Lucas; Arce, Candice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.