Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vuong, Xuan My, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vuong, Xuan My.
Date: September 03, 2021Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by Vuong, Xuan My received but not filed on 09/03/2021.
Date: September 03, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: October 27, 2021Petition for Change of Name filed by Vuong, Xuan My.
Date: September 03, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by Vuong, Xuan My.
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Publication filed by Vuong, Xuan My.
Date: October 12, 2021Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 10/21/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 21, 2021Decree Changing Name filed by Vuong, Xuan My.
Date: October 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.