Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Montie, Sheila R, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Curless, Rockley, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied without. | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/14/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Defective) filed by Montie, Sheila R. Refers to: Curless, Rockley; Kuhl, Karlifornia | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Petitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 10/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department E-21. | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Montie, Sheila R. Refers to: Curless, Rockley; Kuhl, Karlifornia | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/27/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed by Montie, Sheila R. Refers to: Curless, Rockley; Kuhl, Karlifornia | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Montie, Sheila R. Refers to: Curless, Rockley; Kuhl, Karlifornia | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Montie, Sheila R. Refers to: Curless, Rockley; Kuhl, Karlifornia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.