Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Gonzalez, Hilda, Inman, Amber Lynn, Molina, Socorro, Sillas, Luis Miguel, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/24/2021 09:00:00 AM. | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Request filed by Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia. | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia. Refers to: Molina, Socorro | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia. Refers to: Sillas, Luis | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia. Refers to: Inman, Amber | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia. Refers to: Gonzalez, Hilda | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department C-61. | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Sayas Ruiz, Idalia Patricia. Refers to: Molina, Socorro; Sillas, Luis; Gonzalez, Hilda; Inman, Amber | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.