Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Td Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Byron, Kaden, against Ramos, Juan G, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren G. Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Ramos, Juan
Date: August 17, 2021Declaration - Other (Re: Venue) filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Ramos, Juan
Date: August 17, 2021Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Date: March 18, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Ramos, Juan
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Date: July 30, 2022Case initiation form printed.
Date: August 18, 2021Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Ramos, Juan
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/27/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: December 27, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.