Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kenton Properties Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Horwitz, Daniel J, against Beck, Frank, Beck, Kimberly, Clearview Canvas Llc, represented by Saldana, Christopher C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Clearview Canvas LLC; Beck, Frank; Beck, Kimberly.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/18/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Complaint filed by Kenton Properties LLC. Refers to: Clearview Canvas LLC; Beck, Frank; Beck, Kimberly
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Clearview Canvas LLC; Beck, Kimberly; Beck, Frank.
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/20/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 05/12/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: May 12, 2023Trial Brief filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 04/21/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: May 18, 2023Advance Trial Review Order filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Kenton Properties LLC.
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: May 18, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.