Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Belanger, Jane, Belanger, William C, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Dell, Ryan Dennis, O'Dell, Ryan Dennis; Zunshine, Phillip, against Navarro, Jorge, Silver Triangle Industries; Dba : Rancho Construction Group, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with James A Mangione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames A Mangione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration - Other submitted by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C rejected on 08/31/2021.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/10/2021 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 46]
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C rejected on 10/07/2021.
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: NAVARRO, JORGE; Silver Triangle Industries
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 62]
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (1 through 20) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (re: judgment documents) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 71]
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/04/2022 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re attorney fees) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 83]
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CASE SUMMARY) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: October 23, 2023Association of Attorney filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C received but not filed on 08/11/2023.
Date: 2023-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2023-10-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/25/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: October 25, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/08/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: December 08, 2023Proof of Service filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: November 02, 2023Proof of Service by Mail filed by Belanger, William C.
Date: December 01, 2023Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: December 07, 2023[Another document for ROA# 32]
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Judgment submitted by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane received but not filed on 05/19/2022.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 106]
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane rejected on 08/18/2022.
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 92]
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Date: 2021-10-30T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re: Attorney's Fees) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/02/2022 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Belanger, William C; Belanger, Jane.
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/01/2022 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 11/10/2022 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 42]
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: NAVARRO, JORGE; Silver Triangle Industries
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 12]
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Belanger, Jane; Belanger, William C.
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 24]
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.