Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
United Financial Casualty Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Noriega, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 18]
Date: August 05, 2021Original Summons filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Refers to: Noriega, Michael
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: September 07, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by United Financial Casualty Company. Refers to: Noriega, Michael
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Noriega, Michael
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Dismissal of Does (Not Entered) filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: September 10, 2021Judgment by Default by Court (Entered) filed by United Financial Casualty Company.
Date: September 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.