Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Saadzadeh, Mahgol, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Levy, Lawrence, against Felfoldi, Jonathan, Learned, Mikenzi Christine, represented by Kelley, Jane M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Demand for Jury Trial filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Disclosure of Relationship filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/04/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Statement of Damages filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol. Refers to: Learned, Mikenzi; Felfoldi, Jonathan
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/17/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol. Refers to: Learned, Mikenzi; Felfoldi, Jonathan
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol. Refers to: Felfoldi, Jonathan
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol. Refers to: Learned, Mikenzi; Felfoldi, Jonathan
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Complaint filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol. Refers to: Learned, Mikenzi; Felfoldi, Jonathan
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Saadzadeh, Mahgol.
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Answer filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Felfoldi, Jonathan; Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Learned, Mikenzi Christine; Saadzadeh, Mahgol.
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: March 11, 2023Order - Other filed by Learned, Mikenzi Christine.
Date: February 10, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.