Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Crespo-Villa, Joanna, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Goldschmidt, Deon S; Retoriano, Kevin M, against Stutz, Michael, Stutz, Walter, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with James A Mangione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames A Mangione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice - Other (of withdrawal of motion) filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Stutz, Walter. Refers to: Stutz, Michael
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021
Date: 2021-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Crespo-Villa, Joanna. Refers to: Stutz, Michael; Stutz, Walter
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Answer filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Rebecca Rickett) filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Crespo-Villa, Joanna.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Complaint filed by Crespo-Villa, Joanna. Refers to: Stutz, Michael; Stutz, Walter
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Crespo-Villa, Joanna. Refers to: Stutz, Michael; Stutz, Walter
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Stutz, Walter received but not filed on 11/12/2021.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/25/2022 10:15:00 AM.
Date: February 25, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Stutz, Michael.
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Original Summons (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Stutz, Walter. Refers to: Stutz, Michael
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Stutz, Walter.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Answer filed by Stutz, Michael.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.