Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liggins, Heather, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Superior Court Of California, County Of San Diego, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (ORDER DENYING CONSOLIDATED PETITION FOR WRIT) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (Amended Order Consolidating Starks (lead), Liggins, McKinsey, Harris, Brown; Extension to file Reply Brief) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order (Consolidating Starks [Lead], Liggins, and McKinsey Writs; Granting extension of time to file Petitioner's Reply) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by the People. | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate to Appellate Division (Underlying Criminal Case) filed by LIGGINS, HEATHER. | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department Appellate Division. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.