Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pacheco Ramos, Martha Carolina, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Araujo Chairez, Jorge Efran, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 04/26/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied with prejudice. | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Araujo Chairez, Jorge Efran. Refers to: Pacheco Ramos, Martha | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Araujo Chairez, Jorge Efran. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Consuelo Araujo) filed by Araujo Chairez, Jorge Efran. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Jesus Araujo) filed by Araujo Chairez, Jorge Efran. | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (Affidavit of Cancelled Service) filed by Pacheco Ramos, Martha Carolina. Refers to: Araujo Chairez, Jorge | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 . | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Pacheco Ramos, Martha Carolina. Refers to: Araujo Chairez, Jorge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.