Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vega, Elianna, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Pina, Louis, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Louis Pena was granted. | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 05/03/2021 01:30:00 PM. | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing filed by VEGA, ELIANNA. Refers to: PINA, LOUIS | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Response filed by PINA, LOUIS. Refers to: VEGA, ELIANNA | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition (CHTRO) filed by VEGA, ELIANNA. Refers to: PINA, LOUIS | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by VEGA, ELIANNA. Refers to: PINA, LOUIS | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department S-09. | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 05/03/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-09 . | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by VEGA, ELIANNA. Refers to: PINA, LOUIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.