Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Debt Management Partners Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P., against Garay, Roberto ; Aka : Garay, Roberto E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren G. Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Statement of Venue filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Garay, Roberto
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Garay, Roberto
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Garay, Roberto
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Garay, Roberto
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (Entered as to DOES 1-5) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: February 07, 2022Declaration - Other (Case Summary) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: December 13, 2021Proof of Service filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Proposed Order (Not Signed) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Non Military Status) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re: 1788.50) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re: 1033) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re: Interest Calculation) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re: Copies) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court (Entered) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration - Other (re: 1788.58) filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Debt Management Partners LLC received but not filed on 09/27/2022.
Date: September 27, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.