Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Debt Management Partners Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P., against Awad, Omar, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel F. Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel F. Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Statement of Venue filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Awad, Omar
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by Awad, Omar.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: June 23, 2021Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash (Civil) heard 06/01/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: June 01, 2021Proposed Order submitted by Awad, Omar received but not filed on 05/03/2021.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed by Awad, Omar.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Awad, Omar.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash (Civil) heard 07/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: July 06, 2021Proof of Service filed by Awad, Omar.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Awad, Omar
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Awad, Omar.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: November 18, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Awad, Omar
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.