Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Debt Management Partners Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P., against Rice, Charles, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Anthony J. Campagna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony J. Campagna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: April 05, 2021Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: October 15, 2021Statement of Venue filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Rice, Charles
Date: April 05, 2021Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Debt Management Partners LLC; Rice, Charles.
Date: October 15, 2021Original Summons filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Rice, Charles
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Rice, Charles
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Debt Management Partners LLC.
Date: November 17, 2021Stipulated Judgment filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Rice, Charles
Date: October 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.