Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Debt Management Partners Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian, John P., against Cooksey, Patrick, represented by Swigart, Joshua B, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frazier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Cooksey, Patrick
Date: April 05, 2021Case reassigned from C-61 to Ronald Frazier effective 03/03/2022
Date: March 03, 2022Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Cooksey, Patrick
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Debt Management Partners LLC. Refers to: Cooksey, Patrick
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Answer filed by Cooksey, Patrick.
Date: April 26, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.