Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Eckhof, Peter, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Saulpaw, Jacque, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/26/2021 08:30:00 AM. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice. | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention)(CROSS-PETITION) dismissed without prejudice. | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 05/26/2021 at 08:30AM in Department N-03. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Eckhof, Peter. Refers to: Saulpaw, Jacque | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CROSS) filed by Saulpaw, Jacque. Refers to: Eckhof, Peter | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 04/21/2021 08:30:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.