Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hcn G&L Downreit Ii Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weiss, Michael I, against Snider, Robin G, Tuniyants, Deana, Tuniyants, Emil, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Statement filed by HCN G&L DownREIT II LLC.
Date: August 20, 2021Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by HCN G&L DownREIT II LLC.
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: September 03, 2021Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HCN G&L DownREIT II LLC.
Date: September 30, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Complaint filed by HCN G&L DownREIT II LLC. Refers to: Tuniyants, Emil; SNIDER, ROBIN; TUNIYANTS, DEANA
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/03/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: September 03, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.