Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bordelon, Benoit, Roudabush, Maegan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reynolds, Sean P, against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Jericho Capital Llc, Jz Investments, Inc., Karma Capital, Llc, O'Neill, Dennis Charles, (total of 9) See All represented by Kim, Amber N, Stern, Tifanie H., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Statement filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY.
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer (9/10/2021) filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/01/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00General Denial filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY.
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Demurrer (9/10/2021) filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by BORDELON, BENOIT. Refers to: O'NEILL, DENNIS
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (9/10/2021) filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Opposition - Other (09/10/2021) filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by ZERBONI, JEFF.
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Reply filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Answer filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC. Refers to: BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Answer filed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. Refers to: BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (9/10/2021) filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/06/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY.
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (09/10/2021) filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by ZERBONI, JEFF; JERICHO CAPITAL LLC.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Objections filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (7/28/23) filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (7/28/23) filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (7/28/23) filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Objections filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: August 03, 2023Proof of Service by Mail filed by BORDELON, BENOIT; ROUDABUSH, MAEGAN.
Date: 2023-07-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: July 27, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.