Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kidd, Adam Leigh, against Bruno, Erik C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel F. Link presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel F. Link Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: March 03, 2021Proof of Service filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.
Date: March 12, 2021Request for Entry of Default filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.
Date: May 13, 2021Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.
Date: May 14, 2021Statement of Case filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.
Date: May 13, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: BRUNO, ERIK
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Original Summons filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Refers to: BRUNO, ERIK
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.